Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hector Alvarado Onbehalf Of Himself And, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Lavi & Ebrahimian Llp, against Dart Container Corporation Of California, represented by Best Best & Krieger, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Daniel A. Ottolia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel A. Ottolia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management106 days |
Filing DateAugust 02, 2012 |
CategoryDamages&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions659 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2021 | HEARING RE: FINAL APPROVAL | ||
October 05, 2020 |
HEARING RE: FINAL APPROVAL Continued Not Heard |
||
August 21, 2020 |
STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR FOR A NEW FINAL APPROVAL HEARING DATE IS GRA; HONORABLE JUDGE DANIEL A OTTOLIA. Not Applicable |
||
August 18, 2020 |
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: /FOR A NEW FINAL APPROVAL HEARING DATE SUBMITTED BY HECTOR ALVARADO ONBEHALF OF HIMSELF AND. Not Applicable |
||
August 05, 2020 |
HEARING RE: MOTION TO/FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT BY HECTOR ALVARADO ONBEHALF OF HIMSELF AND Granted |
||
August 05, 2020 |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING Off-Calendar |
||
August 05, 2020 |
SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING. Not Applicable |
||
August 05, 2020 | ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT; HONORABLE JUDGE DANIEL A OTTOLIA. | ||
July 21, 2020 |
DECLARATION OF JORDAN D BELLO IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL FILED Not Applicable |
||
July 21, 2020 |
SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MTN FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL FILED Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.