Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Mark Phelps, Phelps, Mark, Smp Construction And Maintenance, Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Gilbert Partida, Partida, Gilbert, against Mathew Phelps, Mathew Phelps Enterprises, Inc, Phelps, Mathew, represented by Anthony Eugene Guzman, Charles Oliver Thompson, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 23, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed
Date: August 23, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for SMP Construction And Maintenance, Inc
Date: August 23, 2021Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: August 23, 2021Initial Case Management Conference 02/14/2022 02:30 PM D- 22
Date: August 24, 2021Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: August 24, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint As to Mathew Phelps Enterprises, Inc Filed
Date: August 31, 2021Declaration of Diligence Filed
Date: August 31, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint As to Mathew Phelps Filed
Date: August 31, 2021Case Management Statement Filed by: Mathew Phelps (Defendant)
Date: February 03, 2022Order re: Initial Case Management Conference Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 14, 2022Minute Order (Initial Case Management Conference)
Date: February 14, 2022Declaration of Diligence Filed
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for SMP Construction And Maintenance, Inc
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 02/14/2022 02:30 PM D- 22
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Mathew Phelps Filed
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Mathew Phelps Enterprises, Inc Filed
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.