Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cannacraft, Inc., Critical Solutions Tech Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against General Agriculture Inc., in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Eumi K. Lee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEumi K. Lee Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 19, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed
Date: August 19, 2021Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: August 19, 2021Default entered as to General Agriculture Inc. On the Complaint filed by Cannacraft, inc. on 08/19/2021
Date: 2022-08-04T00:00:00Default entered as to General Agriculture Inc. On the Complaint filed by Cannacraft, inc. on 08/19/2021
Date: 2022-04-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Cannacraft, Inc.
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 02/14/2022 03:00 PM D- 20
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 05/10/2023 at 01:30 PM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 512 updated: Result Date to 05/10/2023 Result Type to Held - Motion Granted Event |
|
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order re: Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Signed and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Hearing on Motio...) Minute Order |
|
May 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling Published for 05/10/2023 1:30 PM Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel} Tentative Ruling |
|
February 07, 2023 | Default Prove Up Hearing | ||
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Updated -- Ex Parte Proposed Order: Result: Granted Result Date: 01/24/2023 Document |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Proposed Order Signed and Filed by: Cannacraft, Inc. (Plaintiff); Critical Solutions Tech Inc. (Plaintiff) Document |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Default Prove Up Hearing scheduled for 02/07/2023 at 03:00 PM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 512 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 08/01/2023 03:00 PM Event |
|
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 05/24/2023 at 01:30 PM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 512 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 05/10/2023 01:30 PM Event |
|
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil Filed by: Cannacraft, Inc. (Plaintiff); Critical Solutions Tech Inc. (Plaintiff) Document |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.