Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lombardo, Louis, filed a(n) Product Liability case against Syngenta Corp Protection Llc, Syngenta Ag, Chevron U.S.A., Inc., Chevron Phillips Chemical Company Lp, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Brad Seligman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrad Seligman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 26, 2021 |
CategoryProduct Liability |
Last RefreshedSeptember 22, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: September 21, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Louis Lombardo
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Complaint - Product Liability Filed
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Complaint - Product Liability - Motion Rescheduled
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Case Management Conference 08/03/2021 03:00 PM D- 23
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Syngenta AG Filed
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: September 21, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint As to Chevron U.S.A., Inc. Filed
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: September 17, 2021Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Syngenta Corp Protection LLC Filed
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Chevron Phillips Chemical Company LP Filed
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.