Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Kunwar, Amanda, On Behalf Of Themselves And All Others Similarly Situated, Stone, Tamelin, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by David Y Imai, Imai, David Y., against Alameda Health System, Does 1 To 100, Highland Hospital, Mcnichol, Donna, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Brad Seligman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 19, 2021 |
CategoryWrongful Termination |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Notice of Appeal Filed Filed by: With Deposit: Yes
Date: November 19, 2021Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: November 19, 2021Appeal Packet Generated by:
Date: November 19, 2021Appeal - Notice of Default Issued Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: November 30, 2021General Order (Case Management Order) Entered by: Clerk
Date: January 03, 2022Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Dismiss)
Date: January 13, 2022Order re: Hearing on Motion to Dismiss Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 13, 2022General Order (Case Management Order) Entered by: Clerk
Date: January 13, 2022Miscellaneous Billing Notice Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 08, 2021Notice of Hearing Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 21, 2021Complaint - Wrongful Termination Filed (Amended)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Tamelin Stone
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Case Management Conference 06/03/2021 09:00 AM D- 21
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Statement of Plaintiffs' Complex Designation Hearing Filed
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Request Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Winifred Y. Smith Filed for Tamelin Stone, Amanda Kunwar, On
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Request Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Winifred Y. Smith Granted
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Motion Granted
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail / Electronic Service Filed
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Order re Case Management Filed
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Case Management Conference 06/08/2021 03:00 PM D- 23
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Tamelin Stone, Amanda Kunwar, On behalf of themselves and all others si
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Request Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Brad Seligman Filed for Alameda Health System
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Electronic Service Filed
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Request Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Brad Seligman Granted
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Tamelin Stone, Amanda Kunwar, On behalf of themselves and all others si
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Alameda Health System Filed
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Opposition to Motion to Strike Filed
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint Filed by Alameda Health System
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Declaration of David Y. Imari Re: Demurrer and Motion to Strike (Meet and Confer) Filed by Tamelin S
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Objection to Request for Judical Notice Filed
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Declaration of Demurring Party Regarding Meet and Confer Filed by Alameda Health System
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed for Tamelin Stone, Amanda Kunwar, On behalf of themselves and all
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Motion to Strike Filed by Alameda Health System
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Re: 1st Amended Complaint & 1st Amended Summons Filed
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Electronic Service Filed
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Tamelin Stone, Amanda Kunwar, On behalf of themselves and all others si
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Alameda Health System's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Strike Filed
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Alameda Health System's Reply in Support of Its Demurrer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint File
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Alameda Health System's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Its Reply to Demurrer to Plaintiff
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed for Tamelin Stone, Amanda Kunwar, On behalf of themselves and all others simi
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint - Motion Rescheduled
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Case Management Conference 07/09/2021 10:00 AM D- 24
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Opposition to Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Alameda Health System, Donna McNichol Filed
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Tamelin Stone, Amanda Kunwar, On behalf of themselves and all others si
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Motion to Strike - Motion Rescheduled
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint - Motion Rescheduled
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Motion to Strike - Motion Rescheduled
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint - Motion Rescheduled
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Motion to Strike - Motion Rescheduled
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Complaint - Wrongful Termination Filed
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.