Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Reyes, Ron Michael, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Mitchell, Linda, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Noël Wise presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management201 days |
|
Filing DateJune 28, 2019 |
CategoryAuto Tort |
Time To Trial201 days |
Last RefreshedApril 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Management Statement of Linda Mitchell Filed
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Ron Michael Reyes Filed
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Linda Mitchell Filed
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Ron Michael Reyes Filed
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Complaint - Auto Tort Filed
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Application Re: Extension of Time Filed for Ron Michael Reyes
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 11/13/2019 09:00 AM D- 24
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Ron Michael Reyes Filed
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 12/09/2020 09:00 AM D- 24
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed for Ron Michael Reyes
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Linda Mitchell
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Ron Michael Reyes
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: April 08, 2021Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Notice of Lien of Lien Claimant Filed
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Granted
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: March 03, 2021Notice of Settlement Filed for Ron Michael Reyes
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Application Re: Publication of Summons and Complaint Denied
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Re-Notice of re: Change of Handling attorney Filed
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Linda Mitchell Filed
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: March 03, 2021Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Application Re: Publication of Summons and Complaint Filed for Ron Michael Reyes
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Application Re: Extension of Time Granted
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Filed for Linda Mitchell
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Proof of Service Re: Notice of CMC and Order; Notice of Attachment of Judge; Civil Cover Sheet Filed
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.