Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Martin, Michael J., filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Galloway, Barkari, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2012 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions23 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time275 days |
Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Issued
Date: 2012-01-31T00:00:00Judgment Entered
Date: October 31, 2012Request for Entry of Default as to all un-named tenants/occupants Filed and Entered
Date: 2012-02-10T00:00:00Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed
Date: 2012-01-30T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2012-01-30T00:00:00Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's UD Judgment (CCP 1169) As To Barkari Galloway Filed
Date: February 22, 2012Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Filed
Date: August 31, 2012Writ of Possession - Satisfied Filed
Date: March 20, 2012Proof of Service on all un-named tenants/occupants Filed
Date: 2012-02-10T00:00:00Default Judgment: Clerk's UD (CCP 1169) Entered
Date: February 22, 2012Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Michael J. Martin
Date: 2012-01-30T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Barkari Galloway Filed
Date: 2012-02-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.