Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Northbrooke Apartments Lp, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Piterman, Milan, Piterman, Dmitry, Northbrooke Apartments, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Richard O. Keller presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard O. Keller Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management135 days |
Filing DateApril 05, 2011 |
CategoryOther Contract |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time1206 days |
Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Northbrooke Apartments, LLC Filed
Date: 2011-05-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Dmitry Piterman Filed
Date: 2011-08-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Northbrooke Apartments LP
Date: 2011-04-05T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service on Complaint - Other Contract As to Dmitry Piterman Filed
Date: 2011-04-15T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 08/18/2011 02:31 PM D- 608
Date: 2011-04-07T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Civil Law and Motion 10/19/2011 02:30 PM D- 522
Date: 2011-09-08T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support request for court judgment Filed
Date: 2011-06-01T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2011-04-07T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2011-08-18T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2011-08-18T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Dmitry Piterman
Date: 2011-06-06T00:00:00Notice of Of Case Management Conference Filed
Date: 2011-06-09T00:00:00Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Rejected
Date: 2011-08-03T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service on Complaint - Other Contract As to Milan Piterman Filed
Date: 2011-04-15T00:00:00Reply Declaration of Fault in Support of Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default Filed
Date: 2011-10-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Northbrooke Apartments LP Filed
Date: 2011-08-03T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service on Complaint - Other Contract As to Northbrooke Apartments, LLC Filed
Date: 2011-04-15T00:00:00Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Filed
Date: 2011-06-01T00:00:00Notice of Opposition and Opposition to Defts' Motion to Set Aside Default Filed
Date: 2011-10-06T00:00:00Complaint - Other Contract Filed
Date: 2011-04-05T00:00:00Rejection Letter Issued on Answer to Complaint
Date: 2011-06-06T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2011-04-05T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 12/09/2011 02:30 PM D- 522
Date: 2011-09-20T00:00:00Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Milan Piterman Filed
Date: 2011-05-24T00:00:00Motion to Vacate/Set Aside Default Filed for Defendant
Date: 2011-07-21T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2011-10-19T00:00:00Reply Declaration of Edward C. Singer, Jr. in Support of Motion to Set Aside Filed
Date: 2011-10-13T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed
Date: July 22, 2014Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2011-12-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Dmitry Piterman, Milan Piterman, Northbrooke Apartments, LLC Filed
Date: 2012-06-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Northbrooke Apartments LP Filed
Date: 2012-06-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Northbrooke Apartments LP Filed
Date: 2011-12-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Northbrooke Apartments LP Filed
Date: 2012-11-02T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: April 04, 2014Case Management Statement of Northbrooke Apartments LP Filed
Date: 2013-02-26T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2012-11-19T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2013-07-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Dmitry Piterman, Milan Piterman, Northbrooke Apartments, LLC Filed
Date: 2013-07-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Northbrooke Apartments LP Filed
Date: 2013-07-08T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2011-12-09T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Entered
Date: July 24, 2014Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2012-03-22T00:00:00Conditional Settlement Entire Action (CRC 3.1385)
Date: July 03, 2014Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2012-03-22T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2012-07-02T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2012-11-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Northbrooke Apartments LP Filed
Date: 2013-11-19T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2013-12-03T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2013-03-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Dmitry Piterman Filed
Date: 2013-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2012-01-19T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Dmitry Piterman, Milan Piterman, Northbrooke Apartments, LLC
Date: 2011-11-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Dmitry Piterman Filed
Date: 2012-03-14T00:00:00Motion to Vacate/Set Aside Default - Granted As to PARTY
Date: 2011-10-19T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2013-03-12T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2012-07-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Dmitry Piterman Filed
Date: 2011-12-08T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2013-12-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Northbrooke Apartments LP Filed
Date: 2012-03-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Northbrooke Apartments LP Filed
Date: 2012-11-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Northbrooke Apartments LP Filed
Date: 2014-03-24T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2013-07-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Northbrooke Apartments LP Filed
Date: July 03, 2014Order Setting Aside Default Filed
Date: 2011-10-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Dmitry Piterman, Milan Piterman, Northbrooke Apartments, LLC Filed
Date: 2013-12-03T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: April 04, 2014Case Management Statement of Dmitry Piterman, Milan Piterman, Northbrooke Apartments, LLC Filed
Date: 2014-04-01T00:00:00Case Management Conf Continuance 09/30/2014 02:30 PM D- 522
Date: July 10, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.