Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Okazaki, Keiko, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Tanaka, Masayuki, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Michael M. Markman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael M. Markman Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 08, 2008 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions928 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time3185 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Withdrawal of Attorney Filed for Keiko Okazaki | |
January 31, 2014 |
Family Law Status Conference
Judge: Michael M. Markman |
||
January 31, 2014 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference Commenced and Completed | |
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order Filed | |
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Of Entry Of Order Filed | |
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service By Fax And Mail Filed | |
January 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Request Re: Ex Parte Application for Earnings Assignment Order Granted | |
January 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Granted | |
January 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Findings and Order After Hearing re Spousal Support,.. Filed | |
January 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Received |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.