Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Holloway, Kimberly, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2020 |
CategoryGuardianship - Person |
Last RefreshedMarch 15, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Guardianship Annual Review Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Tickler | |
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Guardianship Annual Review Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Report | |
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order (Cover Sheet - Electronic Filing) | |
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Letter Returned | |
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Confidential Guardianship Status Report | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Annual Guardianship Review Hearing | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Referral to Sherry Scott |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.