Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Borrowman, Hedwig K, Truschinger, Rhonda S, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Douglas K Mann presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 07, 2021 |
CategoryPetition For Letters Of Administration |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Petition for Letters of Special Administration Filed
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Hearing
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Proposed Action Filed
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Creditor's Claim Filed
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 30, 2022Inventory & Appraisal Filed
Date: 2022-11-30T00:00:00Rejection of Creditor's Claim Filed
Date: November 30, 2022Order Appointing Personal Representative
Date: March 03, 2022Letters Issued - Special Administration
Date: May 13, 2021Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: May 07, 2021Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed
Date: February 09, 2022Document Received
Date: April 27, 2022Proof of Publication Filed
Date: February 23, 2022Waiver Filed Re:
Date: December 07, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: December 12, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 30, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Proposed Action Filed
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Petition Filed
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Hearing
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Declaration re:
Date: 2022-11-29T00:00:00Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 24, 2023Notice of Proposed Action Filed
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Creditor's Claim Filed
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Proposed Action Filed
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00Returned Mail Received from Postal Service
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00Notice of Proposed Action Filed
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Returned Mail Received from Postal Service
Date: 2022-08-17T00:00:00Creditor's Claim Filed
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Ex Parte Application Filed
Date: 2022-11-30T00:00:00Accounting Report Filed
Date: 2022-11-15T00:00:00Inventory & Appraisal Filed
Date: 2022-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Proposed Action Filed
Date: May 05, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: May 07, 2021Notice of Proposed Action Filed
Date: October 11, 2022Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative Filed
Date: February 08, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: May 07, 2021Notice of Proposed Action Filed
Date: November 10, 2022Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative Filed
Date: May 07, 2021Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed
Date: February 09, 2022Notice of Proposed Action Filed
Date: May 05, 2022Order Appointing Administrator with Bond of
Date: May 13, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: September 26, 2022Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: February 24, 2023Accounting Not Filed-Hearing Set
Date: August 04, 2022Letters Issued
Date: March 03, 2022Returned Mail Received from Postal Service
Date: May 10, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 30, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.