Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Blandford, Doris, filed a(n) Succession of Property - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Candice Garcia-Rodrigo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCandice Garcia-Rodrigo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2018 |
CategoryPetition To Determine Succession To Real Property |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeSuccession of Property |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time48 days |
Petition to Determine Succession to Real Property Filed
Date: December 28, 2018Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: December 28, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: January 08, 2019Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: January 29, 2019Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: February 07, 2019Order Determining Succession to Real Property Filed
Date: February 14, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event | FEE PAYMENT 190215-0434-CK MJF/ 25.00 FCP/ 1.00 PAYMT 190215-0434-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 7504 | |
February 14, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER DETERMINING SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED. | |
February 14, 2019 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY DORIS BLANDFORD FOR CERTIFIED COPIES 190214-0229-CK MJF/ 25.00 FCP/ 1.00 PAYMT 190214-0229-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 7515 | |
February 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY CYNTHIA LUDVIGSEN,JUDGE CLERK: CHRISTINE SPENCER COURT REPORTER KIM MCGILVARY;11522 COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. 08:53 - 09:27 ATTORNEY BENJAMIN SELTERS PRESENT FOR PETITIONER. - PROCEEDINGS: PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER) PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY OF DORIS BLANDFORD IS GRANTED ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE. COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY OF DORIS BLANDFORD ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE) DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE) ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Probate Notes - Hearing Date of HRG OF 02/14/19 - PROBATE NOTES |
|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Probate Notes - Hearing Date of HRG OF 02/14/19 - PROBATE NOTES |
|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING ON 02/14/19 FILED. | |
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event | PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED. | |
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED. | |
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Conversion event 0001 - DS PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.