Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cruz, Erick Franco, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case represented by Romick, Liat Amsily, against Erick Franco Cruz, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts Superior with John P. Devine presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn P. Devine Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 18, 2020 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Person Only |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
|
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time38 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
HEARING RE: PTN FOR SPECIAL IMMIGRANT JUVENILE FINDINGS FILED ON 09/18/20 BY ERICK FRANCO CRUZ - Minutes NOT HEARD/CONT Judge: John P. Devine |
|
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
HEARING RE: PTN FOR APPT OF GDN, PERSON FILED ON 09/18/20 BY ERICK FRANCO CRUZ - Minutes NOT HEARD/CONT Judge: John P. Devine |
|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
LETTERS OF GUARDIANSHIP OF THE PERSON ISSUED/FILED Not Applicable |
|
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPOINTING GRDN OF PERSON FILED, NO BOND REQUIRED, ORDER EXPIRES: UTNIL FURTHER COURT ORDER Not Applicable |
|
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
(PROBATE) CONFIDENTIAL SPECIAL IMMIGRANT JUVENILE FINDINGS FILED Not Applicable |
|
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
HEARING RE: PTN FOR SPECIAL IMMIGRANT JUVENILE FINDINGS FILED ON 09/18/20 BY ERICK FRANCO CRUZ - Minutes GRANTED Judge: John P. Devine |
|
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
HEARING RE: PTN FOR APPT OF GDN, PERSON FILED ON 09/18/20 BY ERICK FRANCO CRUZ - Minutes GRANTED Judge: John P. Devine |
|
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
LETTERS OF GARDIANSHIP OF THE PERSON ISSUED/FILED Not Applicable |
|
September 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
HEARING WAS FOR 11/18/20 AT 9:30 IN DEPT. 30
Judge: Virginia M. George |
|
September 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 30
Judge: Virginia M. George |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.