Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Maspaitella, Balthazar Peter, Maspaitella, Jodi Ralene, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case represented by Pro Se, against Rayvonna Jovita Castro Williams, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts Superior with John P. Devine presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn P. Devine Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 09, 2020 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Person Only |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | HEARING RE: PET. FOR TERMINATION OF GUARDIANSHIP FILED ON 12/01/21 BY BALTHAZAR PETER MASPAITELLA, JODI RALENE MASPAITELLA - Minutes | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
HEARING RE: PET. FOR TERMINATION OF GUARDIANSHIP FILED ON 12/01/21 BY BALTHAZAR PETER MASPAITELLA, JODI RALENE MASPAITELLA - Minutes Complete |
|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
FILE RETURNED TO COURT RECORDS, MARTINEZ Not Applicable |
|
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON EXPARTE PETITON FOR TERMINATION 03/18/22 @ 9:30 AM FILED DEPT.15 W/POSM:03/01/22 SEE LIST Not Applicable |
|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
FILE RETURNED TO COURT RECORDS, MARTINEZ Not Applicable |
|
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
HEARING RE: PET. FOR TERMINATION OF GUARDIANSHIP FILED ON 12/01/21 BY BALTHAZAR PETER MASPAITELLA, JODI RALENE MASPAITELLA - Minutes Complete |
|
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event | HEARING RE: PET. FOR TERMINATION OF GUARDIANSHIP FILED ON 12/01/21 BY BALTHAZAR PETER MASPAITELLA, JODI RALENE MASPAITELLA - Minutes | |
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | HEARING WAS FOR 1/12/22 AT 9:30 IN DEPT. 15 | |
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
(U.J.) NON-PARTY SUBSEQUENT PETITION FOR TERMINATION OF GUARDIANSHIP OF PERSON FILED BY BALTHAZAR P MASPAITELLA AND JODI MASPAITELLA Not Applicable |
|
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
LETTERS OF GUARDIANSHIP OF PERSON ISSUED/FILED Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.