Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Eck, Ashley M., filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Wolk, Daniel M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWolk, Daniel M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 09, 2021 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
*Other Hearing
Date: May 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Other Hearing 1st Supp. to Petn Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Last Will & Testament | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition Granted ORDER SIGNED |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof / Affidavit of Publication IN THE DAVIS ENTERPRISE ON 4/25/21-4/28/21 AND 5/2/21 |
|
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Other Hearing PROBATE Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Continued by Court's Motion | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Lodging of Documents ORDER FOR PROBATE |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Lodging of Documents LETTERS TESTAMENTARY |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Probate FILED |
|
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof / Affidavit of Publication WOODLAND DAILY DEMOCRAT 3/25/21, 3/27/21 AND 4/2/21 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.