Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Wise, Duke Allen, represented by Yolo County Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Fall, Timothy L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFall, Timothy L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 21, 2021 |
CategoryState Parole Revocation |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Arraignment on Violation of Parole
Date: April 23, 2021Violation of Parole Hearing - contested
Date: May 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Violation of Parole Hearing - contested
Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Violation of Parole Hearing - contested
Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Violation of Parole Hearing - contested
Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Documents Released to DPD Bradford re: CDCR |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Remanded to the Custody of the Sheriff. Bail is set in the amount of $50,000 |
|
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To SDT TO CCU |
|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Violation of Parole Hearing - contested Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Remanded to the Custody of the Sheriff. Bail is set in the amount of: $50,000 |
|
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Arraignment on Violation of Parole Judge: Dyer, Tom M. |
|
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment JUDGE FALL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.