Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Boston, Pamela, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Wolk, Daniel M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWolk, Daniel M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2020 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Petition
Date: January 26, 2021Conservatorship Review Accounting
Date: July 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Conservatorship Review Accounting Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition Granted | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR APPROVAL OF PETITION FOR WAIVER OF ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF EXECUTOR, PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF COMPENSATION FOR STATUTORY ATTORNEY FEES, COMPENSATION FOR STATUTORY ADMINISTRATOR FEES AND FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response - No Fee TO PROBATE NOTES |
|
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Waiver OF NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION |
|
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Lodging of Documents ORDER |
|
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To LODGED ORDER SENT TO CAL SHELF |
|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Lodging of Documents ORDER |
|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Probate FILED |
|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents WE ARE RETURNING THIS FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS; PLEASE FILE WITH $435 FILING FEE AND RESUBMIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.