Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Butte County Counsel filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Barbara L. Roberts presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarbara L. Roberts Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 1994 |
CategoryConservatorship Of Person & Estate |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case File Imaged CASE PREPARED FOR MICROFILMING BOX #44 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SLG |
|
July 29, 2010 | Docket Event | RECEIPT FLD- COUNTY COUNSEL FEES Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: NCE | |
June 24, 2010 | Docket Event | Supervision Termination - Order Terminating Conservatorship | |
June 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration and Order re Conservatorship Investigation DECL & ORDER RE C'TORSHIP INVESTIGATION - WV Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMN |
|
June 24, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTLING FINAL ACCT & RPT OF C'TOR Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMN | |
June 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Review Accounting Desc: SEVENTH & FINAL ACCTG, CTOR/GDN, FEES Desc2: CONT'D FROM 5/22/10 PER AMEND NTC Desc3: C'TEE DECEASED 4/20/09 Disp Code: 220 - APPROVED Disp Clerk: JMN Filing Clerk: JMN Judge: Roberts, Barbara L |
|
June 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Review Accounting Desc: ACCOUNTING Desc2: con't from 3/25/10 Desc3: c'tee deceased Disp Code: 936 - OFF-CALENDAR, REQS MET; ACCTNG FILED Disp Clerk: JMN Filing Clerk: NCE Judge: Roberts, Barbara L |
|
June 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Memorandum INVESTIGATOR'S MEMORANDUM Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMN |
|
May 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Review Accounting Desc: SEVENTH & FINAL ACCTG, CTOR/GDN, FEES Desc2: **AMENDED TO FOLLOW** Disp Code: 906 - CONTINUED TO 6/24/10 PER AMEND NTC Disp Clerk: JMN Filing Clerk: JMN Judge: Roberts, Barbara L |
|
April 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Amended - No Fee AMENDED NTC HRNG Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.