Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Mandelaris, Richard A, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Wolk, Daniel M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWolk, Daniel M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 12, 2020 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Other Hearing
Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response - No Fee Response to Probate Notes |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Lodging of Documents Order of Final Distribution on Waiver of Accounting |
|
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Filed Waiver of Accounting |
|
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Lodging of Documents | |
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Other Subsequent Petition Filed PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING AND FOR ALLOWANCE OF STATUTORY FEES |
|
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Inventory & Appraisal FINAL |
|
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letters Issued Conservatorship LTR TESTAMENTARY Notes: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY |
|
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Last Will & Testament WILL Notes: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF |
|
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROBATE MINUTE ORDER Petition PROBATE Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.