Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lutz, Joy, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Wolk, Daniel M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWolk, Daniel M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 13, 2020 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
This complaint is a probate minute order from the Superior Court of the State of California, County of Yolo. The case number is PR-2020-135, and it pertains to the estate of Zamminer. The proceedings mentioned in the document are a petition for proba...
Petition
Date: September 01, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Other Hearing FINAL DISTRIBUTION Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice OF PROPOSED ACTION - CONSENT |
|
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Probate FILED |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Lodging of Documents ORDER DIRECTING FINAL DISTRIBUTION AND ALLOWING COMPENSATION |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition Filed PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION AND FOR ALLOWANCE OF COMPENSATION FOR STATUTORY AND EXTRAORDINARY SERVICES |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF ZACHARY R RAYO IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR COMPENSATION FOR EXTRAORIDINARY SERVICES | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Probate ISSUED |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To LODGED DOCS SENT TO CAL SHELF |
|
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION: PLEASE RESUBMIT WITH $435.00 FILING FEE. THANK YOU. |
|
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Inventory & Appraisal FILED BY JOY LUTZ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.