Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Public Guardian filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 05, 1995 |
CategoryGuardianship |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
BIENNIAL REVIEW
Judge: Judge, Assigned |
|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: OF FINAL DISCHARGE |
|
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
PROBATE MINUTE ORDER Conservatorship Review Accounting ACCOUNT & REPORT ON CONSERVATORSHIP Judge: Gaard, Janet N |
|
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: ORDER APPROVING THIRTEENTH AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT AND GRANTING DISCHARGE OF CONSERVATOR | |
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Accounting Report ACCOUNT & REPORT* Notes: THIRTEENTH AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF CONSERVATOR AND PETITION FOR DISCHARGE OF CONSERVATOR (PROBATE) |
|
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing NTC OF HEARING Notes: NOTICE OF HEARING ON 9/14/2018 |
|
March 15, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE* Notes: NOTICE OF THE CONSERVATEE'S DEATH | |
March 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
PROBATE MINUTE ORDER Conservatorship Review Accounting ACCOUNT & REPORT ON CONSERVATORSHIP Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
March 03, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: ORDER APPROVING 12TH A&R OF CONSERVATOR | |
March 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Probate Investigator Fees Waived PROB INV FEES WAIVED Notes: PROBATE INVESTIGATOR FEES WAIVED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.