Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sorenson, Nancy C filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Kathleen M. White presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKathleen M. White Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 11, 1995 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
ANNUAL REVIEW AMBER SORENSON-MINOR SHARI AND ERIC SCHAFFER-GUARDIANS MINOR WILL BE TURNING 18 AND PLANS ON ATTENDING SCHOOL IN ALASKA TO BECOME A VET GUARDIANSHIP EXPIRES 8/13/12 BY OPERATION OF LAW.
Judge: White, Kathleen M |
|
March 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
ANNUAL REVIEW
Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
March 20, 2012 | Docket Event | REPORT* Notes: CONFIDENTIAL GUARDIANSHIP STATUS REPORT OF ERIC SHAFF ER | |
March 20, 2012 | Docket Event | REPORT* Notes: CONFIDENTIAL GUARDIANSHIP STATUS REPORT BY SHARI SHAF FER | |
March 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE AWAY |
|
January 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Continued by Court's Motion CONT BY COURT'S MTN |
|
January 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF CONTINUANCE |
|
April 18, 2011 | Docket Event | CLAIM PAID Notes: WARRANT # 26437 Claim # Amount $ 450.00 | |
April 06, 2011 | Docket Event | CLAIM FORM TO FISCAL Notes: CLAIM TO FISCAL FOR REFUND TO SHARI & ERIC SHAFFER, 851 FORDHAM DRIVE, WOODLAND, REFUND COURT INVESTIGATOR FEE BY ORDER OF COURT 3/30/11 | |
March 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Petition SEE ENTRIES OF OTHER PETN TO TERM GUAR CAL 3-30-11 Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.