Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Public Guardian filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 13, 1995 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration for Final Discharge DECL FIN DISCH & ORD Notes: EX PARTE PETITION FOR FINAL DISCHARGE AND ORDER |
|
March 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Declaration for Final Discharge DECL FIN DISCH & ORD Notes: DELCARATION FOR FINAL DISCHARGE AND ORDER |
|
February 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order ORD SETTLING* Notes: ORDER SETTLING SIXTH AND FINAL REPORT OF CONSERVATOR AND GRANTING PETITION FOR DISCHARGE OF CONSERVATOR |
|
February 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Petition Granted PETN GRANTED |
|
February 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Conservatorship Terminated - Death of Conservatee TERMINATE CONS Notes: TERMINATION OF CONSERVATORSHIP |
|
February 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Review Accounting ACCOUNT AND REPORT BY BRET BANDLEY BY HOPE WELTON PETITION FOR DISCHARGE GRANTED SIXTH AND FINAL ACCT APPROVED; SETTLED AND ALLOWED Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
January 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing NTC OF HEARING* Notes: NOTICE OF HEARING ON 6TH ACCT AND REPORT by Yolo County Public Guardian |
|
January 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Accounting Report ACCOUNT & REPORT* Notes: SIXTH AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF CONSERVATOR AND PETITION FOR DISCHARGE OF CONSERVATOR |
|
January 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
Conversion Notes WORKLOAD ONLY -JBSIS |
|
February 26, 2004 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: SHELF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.