Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bartley, David filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 10, 1996 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: PROBATE FILE AWAY |
|
October 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Supv Termination - Order Terminating Conservatorship ORD TERMINATE* Notes: ORDER TERMINATING GUARDIANSHIP |
|
October 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
Petition for Termination of Guardian PATRICIA & LOUIS BARTLEY PRESENT DEBBIE BARTLEY PRESENT PETITION GRANTED PARTIES REFERRED TO F/L FACILITATOR Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
October 24, 2007 | Docket Event | REPORT* Notes: REPORT OF OF COURT INVESTIGATOR | |
October 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: CONFIDENTIAL ENVELOPE INSIDE FILE, ON PROBATE CALENDAR SHELF (RM 103) |
|
October 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: BUNKER FILE AWAY |
|
October 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAILING* Notes: SERVED ANDREA MCGRATH, DEBI BARTLEY, RORI RUSSELL AND RACHEL MCGRATH BY MAIL ON 9/25/07: NOT OF HEARING |
|
September 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Court Investigator ORD APPT CRT INVEST |
|
September 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing NTC OF HEARING* Notes: NOTICE OF HEARING ON TERMINATION OF GUARIDANSHIP by Louis & Patricia Bartley |
|
September 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
Petition for Termination of Guardian PETN TERMINATE GUARD Notes: PETN TERMINATE GUARDIANSHIP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.