Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sheeler, Harriet E, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 18, 1997 |
CategoryGeneral Probate |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 1998 | Docket Event | Decree Final Discharge OF HARRIET E. SHEELER AS ADMNR FILED & FILMED 04-13-98. | |
April 18, 1997 | |||
April 18, 1997 | Docket Event | Order SETTLING AMENDED 1ST & FINAL REPORT & ACCNT,DECREE OF FINAL DSBN,AWARDING FEES & EX FEES,REDUC | |
April 18, 1997 | Docket Event | Account Settled, Petition for Distribution Granted | |
April 18, 1997 | Docket Event | Probate Commenced and Completed | |
March 31, 1997 | Docket Event | Petition for Final Distribution FOR FEES,EX FEES & FOR RESERVE OF FUNDS & 1ST & FINAL REPORT & ACCNT | |
March 18, 1997 | Docket Event | Probate 04/18/1997 09:30 AM D-32 | |
March 18, 1997 | Docket Event | Petition for Final Distribution FOR FEES,EX FEES & FOR RESERVE OF FUNDS & 1ST & FINAL REPORT & ACCNT | |
November 22, 1996 | |||
November 22, 1996 | Docket Event | Account Settled and Allowed. Fees Allowed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.