Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
American Express Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Bleier Elizabeth A., Zwicker & Assocaites, against Ragde Jorge, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Chatsworth Courthouse with David W. Stuart presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 09, 2011 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions141 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseChatsworth Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment By Court - Before Trial |
Case Cycle Time141 days |
Document:Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2012-03-29T00:00:00Document:Writ of Execution Issued Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2012-09-28T00:00:00Document:Request to Enter Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2012-01-10T00:00:00Summons Filed by null
Date: 2011-11-09T00:00:00Document:Abstract of Judgment Issued Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2012-12-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2012-09-28T00:00:00Document:Writ of Execution Issued Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: January 31, 2017Complaint filed-Summons Issued Filed by null PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2011-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2012-02-17T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2012-12-05T00:00:00Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-08-03T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2013-02-27T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2013-01-04T00:00:00Document:Complaint filed-Summons Issued Filed by: N/A
Date: 2011-11-09T00:00:00Document:Opposition Points & Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2012-11-19T00:00:00Document:Request for Entry of Default Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2012-01-10T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: N/A
Date: 2011-11-09T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2012-11-19T00:00:00Document:Request for Dismissal-Partial Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2012-01-10T00:00:00Writ of Execution Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: January 31, 2017Case Management Statement Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2012-03-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: January 23, 2017Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: February 17, 2017Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2012-03-15T00:00:00Document:Memorandum of Costs Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2012-09-28T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2012-03-29T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2013-01-04T00:00:00Judgment Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2012-03-29T00:00:00Summary Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2012-03-28T00:00:00Writ of Execution Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2012-09-28T00:00:00Document:Satisfaction of Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: June 13, 2017Order Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2012-03-29T00:00:00Document:Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2012-02-17T00:00:00Document:Summary Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2012-03-28T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2011-11-29T00:00:00Document:Memorandum of Costs Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-01-23T00:00:00Document:Abstract of Judgment Issued Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: February 17, 2017Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-01-23T00:00:00Opposition Points & Authorities Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2012-11-19T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2013-02-27T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2012-01-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-01-23T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-08-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2011-11-29T00:00:00Notice Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2012-11-19T00:00:00Complaint filed-Summons Issued
Date: 2011-11-09T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2012-01-10T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2011-11-09T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs
Date: 2012-09-28T00:00:00Writ of Execution
Date: 2012-09-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2011-11-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2012-03-15T00:00:00Order
Date: 2012-03-29T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2012-03-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2012-02-17T00:00:00Summary
Date: 2012-03-28T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: 2012-12-05T00:00:00Order
Date: 2013-02-27T00:00:00Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: June 13, 2017Memorandum of Costs
Date: 2017-01-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-01-23T00:00:00Opposition Points & Authorities
Date: 2012-11-19T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2012-11-19T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2013-01-04T00:00:00Writ of Execution
Date: January 31, 2017Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2016-08-03T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: February 17, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.