Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Tuso, Lynn, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryProbate Of Will - Letters Testamentary |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Case Cycle Time2296 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to J6 effective 04/13/2012. | |
August 17, 2007 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Waiver of Accounting and Final Distribution heard 08/16/2007 09:00:00 AM. | |
August 16, 2007 | |||
August 16, 2007 | Docket Event | 8/16/07 Graduated Filing Fee Schedule filed by Lynn Tuso | |
August 16, 2007 | Docket Event | Order - Other (for Final Distribution on Waiver of Final Account and Allowance of Statutory Fees) filed by TUSO, LYNN on 08/16/2007. | |
August 16, 2007 | Docket Event | Inventory and Appraisal Attachment (Final) filed by TUSO, LYNN on 08/16/2007. | |
August 15, 2007 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling published. | |
August 06, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing (re: Petition for Final Distribution on Waiver of Final Account and Report and for Fees) filed by TUSO, LYNN on 08/06/2007. | |
July 19, 2007 | Docket Event | Waiver of Accounting and Final Distribution - scheduled for 08/16/2007 at 09:00:00 AM in 44 at Ventura. | |
July 19, 2007 | Docket Event | Petition on Waiver of Accounting (Fees and Final Distribution) filed by TUSO, LYNN on 07/19/2007. Filed By: TUSO, LYNN(Petitioner) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.