Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Butler, Ann, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case against Alameda-Contra Costa Transit District, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 11, 1996 |
CategoryPersonal Injury -Auto |
Last RefreshedMarch 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 1996 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISM, W/PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION FILED | |
November 13, 1996 | Docket Event | STATUS HEARING 12/12/1996 02:00:00 PM D-14 | |
October 11, 1996 | Docket Event | REMARKS | |
August 09, 1996 | Docket Event | CONTINUED 11/08/1996 09:30:00 AM D-14 | |
August 09, 1996 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD | |
July 25, 1996 | Docket Event | REMARKS | |
July 25, 1996 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD | |
July 25, 1996 | Docket Event | CONTINUED 08/09/1996 09:30:00 AM D-14 | |
July 22, 1996 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM TO SET FILED | |
July 19, 1996 | Docket Event | SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.