Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Wells, Bob presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 18, 2014 |
CategoryJuvenile Non-Traffic (Ntsq) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Case Cycle Time35 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Suspend Billing | |
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Check to Refer Case to Shasta | |
January 16, 2015 | Docket Event | DMV FTP Update Processed | |
January 15, 2015 | Docket Event | DMV Communications | |
November 12, 2014 | Docket Event | DMV Communications | |
November 12, 2014 | Docket Event | DMV Conviction Update Processed | |
October 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
October 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Disclaimer | |
October 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
October 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Traffic Arraignment
Judge: Wells, Bob |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.