Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Vet Set Go Llc, filed a(n) Other Civil Petition (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Jujlie D Noe Law Office Of, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse with Patrick T. Madden presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatrick T. Madden Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 25, 2018 |
CategoryOther Civil Petition (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseGovernor George Deukmejian Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeLegacy Judgment |
Case Cycle Time41 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Conference-Case Management Mark C. Kim 8:30 am | |
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Conference-Case Management Patrick T. Madden 8:30 am | |
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event Result:Conference-Case Management Advanced to this date & Vacated | |
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department S27 Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Case Ordered Reassigned Mark C. Kim 8:30 am | |
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department S27 Unknown Event Type |
|
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner | |
June 11, 2018 | Hearing |
Notice Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event Result:Hearing On Petition Granted | |
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.