Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Papalii Sarah Ann, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse with John D. Lord presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn D. Lord Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2002 |
CategoryPetition For Change Of Name (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
|
Filing Court HouseGovernor George Deukmejian Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeLegacy Judgment |
Case Cycle Time1840 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Dispo/Manner:Judgment by Court-Petition Granted 1840 Days | |
December 15, 2006 | Hearing | Calendaring:OSC-Failure to 'OTHER' Douglas Haigh | |
February 14, 2002 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:HEARING ON NAME CHANGE John D. Lord 1:30 pm | |
February 14, 2002 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2002-02-14 00:00:00 | |
February 14, 2002 | Docket Event |
in Department 4 Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change |
|
February 14, 2002 | Docket Event |
in Department 4 Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change |
|
January 07, 2002 | Hearing | Calendaring:HEARING ON NAME CHANGE John D. Lord | |
January 04, 2002 | Docket Event | Document:Petn for Change of Name filed Filed by: N/A | |
January 04, 2002 | Docket Event | Case Filed/Opened:Civil Petition - Change of Name | |
January 04, 2002 | Docket Event |
Petition for Change of Name Filed by null PROCEEDINGS HELD Filed by null |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.