Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Housing Authority Of County Of Butte, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Potter, Dirk, against Brewer, Misty, Frank, Tim, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Leonard D. Goldkind presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLeonard D. Goldkind Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2013 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Time To Trial29 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions36 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time441 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE FILE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC 68152 AND STANDING ORDER BCSC 2006-SO-05 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MME | |
February 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Desc: REVIEW Desc2: STATUS OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT Disp Code: 331 - DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE Disp Clerk: PBP Filing Clerk: JMS Judge: Goldkind, Leonard D |
|
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Returned WRIT OF POSS RETURNED-PEACEFUL POSS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KLD |
|
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED CK#8110 Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 680541 Fee Amount: 25.00 Entry Clerk: MMC 542 - $25.00 | |
January 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Desc: COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER Desc3: CONT FROM 1/16/14 Disp Code: 370 - STIPULATED JUDGMENT; REVIEW SET Disp Clerk: JMS Filing Clerk: KLD Judge: Goldkind, Leonard D |
|
January 23, 2014 | Docket Event | MEDIATION RESOLUTION AGREEMENT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMS | |
January 23, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT; JUDICIALLY SUPERVISED SETTLEMENT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMS | |
January 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF TIME & PLACE OF CONTINUED COURT TRIAL Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KLD |
|
January 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Desc: COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER Notice Date: 2013-12-31 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 342 - HEARD IN PART-CONT FOR FURTH HRG Disp Clerk: KLD Filing Clerk: KLD Judge: Goldkind, Leonard D |
|
January 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF TIME & PLACE OF COURT TRIAL Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KLD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.