Case Last Refreshed: 5 years ago
Elnora Smith, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Pro Per, against Schylon Stewart, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2019 |
|
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2017 | Action | DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 40 TO 25. | |
July 27, 2016 | Action | HEARING ON F/L MTN/OSC TO/FOR MODIFY VISITATION TERMS RE: CONTACT WITH FATHER ( PRO/PER)(ATTY) | |
June 23, 2016 | Action | HEARING ON MTN/OSC WAS SET FOR 7/27/16 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 40 | |
June 23, 2016 | Action | FAMILY LAW REQUEST FOR ORDERS (WITH CUSTODY/VISITATION) RE: MODIFY VISITATION RE: CONTACT WITH FATHER, FILED BY: ELNORA SMITH | |
June 23, 2016 | Action | REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY ELNORA SMITH (CONFIDENTIAL) | |
June 23, 2016 | Action | ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO ELNORA SMITH IS GRANTED | |
August 27, 2015 | Action | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED. ERIN BEAVERS SUBSTITUTES OUT AS ATTORNEY FOR SCHYLON STEWART AND IS REPLACED BY PRO/PER | |
August 27, 2015 | Action | UPDATED CASE TO CHANGE ADDRESS OF PARTY SCHYLON STEWART | |
June 03, 2015 | Action | STIPULATION & ORDER GRANDMOTHER VISITATION (MOU OF 4/17/15 ADOPTED) FILED | |
June 03, 2015 | Action | HEARING ON F/L MTN/OSC TO/FOR VISITATION ( AYANA K. YOUNG)(ATTY) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.