Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The District Attorney, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with James L. Curry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames L. Curry Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2001 |
CategorySexually Violent Predator (W&I 6600) (Mho) |
Time To Trial117 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
|
Case Cycle Time6496 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Documents Received From | |
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event | MH State Hospital Report | |
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event | MH State Hospital Report | |
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event | MH State Hospital Report | |
February 02, 2016 | Docket Event | MH State Hospital Report | |
January 20, 2015 | Docket Event | MH State Hospital Report | |
April 02, 2013 | Docket Event | MH State Hospital Report | |
August 03, 2012 | Docket Event | Receipt for Exhibits | |
July 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice and Order Disposition of Exhibits CR | |
January 20, 2012 | Docket Event | MH State Hospital Report |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.