Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gonzalez, Marco Antonio, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Rivera, Frankie Steven, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Pacione, Lisa M. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 18, 2021 |
Category43-Ch Civil Harassment - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2021 | Hearing | Petition for Harassment | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Harassment Restraining Order After Hearing (CH-130)
Judge: Pacione, Lisa M. |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service (CH-200) | |
August 05, 2021 | Hearing |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing (CH-116)
Judge: Cervantes, Gina |
|
August 05, 2021 | Hearing |
Petition for Harassment
Judge: Cervantes, Gina |
|
July 15, 2021 | Hearing |
To ensure the public has access to court proceedings during the COVID-19 pandemic, this court will be audio live streaming all non-confidential matters. This alternative method for observing courtroom proceedings is strongly encouraged during this time for all non-parties to avoid attending court in-person where social distancing protocols and limited courtroom access applies. It is also available because Judicial Officers may have to limit, or impose other reasonable restrictions upon, public access to their courtrooms and adjacent hallways based on recommended social distancing requirements. Each judge retains the discretion and authority to refuse, limit or terminate audio live streaming of the proceedings, or portions thereof, pursuant to the factors and prohibitions articulated in California Rules of Court, rule 1.150, and in consideration of other statutory and constitutional provisions. By Court Order and California Rules of Court, rule 1.150, audio live streams may NOT be recorded, broadcasted or rebroadcasted without prior written permission from the Court. Witnesses who have been instructed not to discuss their testimony or court proceedings with others may not listen to the audio streaming of any portion of the trial. |
|
July 15, 2021 | Hearing |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing (CH-116)
Judge: Pacione, Lisa M. |
|
July 15, 2021 | Hearing |
Petition for Harassment
Judge: Pacione, Lisa M. |
|
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
To ensure the public has access to court proceedings during the COVID-19 pandemic, this court will be audio live streaming all non-confidential matters. This alternative method for observing courtroom proceedings is strongly encouraged during this time for all non-parties to avoid attending court in-person where social distancing protocols and limited courtroom access applies. It is also available because Judicial Officers may have to limit, or impose other reasonable restrictions upon, public access to their courtrooms and adjacent hallways based on recommended social distancing requirements. Each judge retains the discretion and authority to refuse, limit or terminate audio live streaming of the proceedings, or portions thereof, pursuant to the factors and prohibitions articulated in California Rules of Court, rule 1.150, and in consideration of other statutory and constitutional provisions. By Court Order and California Rules of Court, rule 1.150, audio live streams may NOT be recorded, broadcasted or rebroadcasted without prior written permission from the Court. Witnesses who have been instructed not to discuss their testimony or court proceedings with others may not listen to the audio streaming of any portion of the trial. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.