Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Douglas A Pfeifle, Administrator Of The Estate Of William A. Pfeifle, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Pfefle, Glenice, Pfefle, Brian, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Lodi Branch with Urie, Phillip presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeUrie, Phillip Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 28, 2011 |
CategoryLimited Civil Unlawful Detainer Residential |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions84 days |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseLodi Branch |
Case Cycle Time2889 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Closed.
Judge: Urie, Phillip |
|
March 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
location changed from Courthouse to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
September 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Milestone of Disposition 30 days met late.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
September 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Milestone of Disposition 45 days met late.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
September 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
September 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Automatic UD Disposition Clock stopped.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
September 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Status of Brian Pfeifle updated to Dismissed without Prejudice.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
September 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Complaint associated on 09/20/2011.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
September 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Status of Glenice Pfeifle updated to Dismissed without Prejudice.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
September 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Status of Douglas A Pfeifle, Administrator of the Estate of William A. Pfeifle updated to Dismissed without Prejudice.
Judge: CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.