Case Last Refreshed: 4 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank, filed a(n) Civil case against Craig A Wagner, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Lodi Branch with David P. Warner presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 18, 1989 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2019 |
|
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseLodi Branch |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2010 | Action | Writ of Execution Returned (Shasta county Writ returned partially satisfied) filed by Wells Fargo Bank on 03/24/2010. | |
May 20, 2008 | Action | Wells Fargo Bank added as a Plaintiff effective 05/20/2008. | |
May 20, 2008 | Action | Wagner, Craig A added as a Defendant effective 05/20/2008. | |
May 20, 2008 | Action | Loeb, Steven S. added as a Attorney effective 05/20/2008. | |
May 20, 2008 | Action | Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank on 01/18/1989. | |
May 20, 2008 | Action | All entries prior to this date see file | |
May 20, 2008 | Action | Writ issued to Shasta County | |
May 20, 2008 | Action | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Wells Fargo Bank on 05/20/2008. | |
May 20, 2008 | Action | Abstract of Judgment filed by Wells Fargo Bank on 05/20/2008. | |
May 20, 2008 | Action | Case initiation completed. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.