Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
7301 Medical Center Associates Inc, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Cary Timothy Edward, against Does 1-25, Flow Masters Llc, Jsl Plumbing Co. Inc, Russell-Warner Inc, Kerrygold Plumbing Inc, (total of 7) See All represented by Boehle Wayne Joseph, Braasch Debra Lynn, Gilbert Warren Leigh, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Van Nuys Courthouse East with FRANK J. JOHNSON presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management72 days |
|
Filing DateJune 05, 2012 |
CategoryProduct Liability (Not Asbestos Or Toxic/Environmental) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions493 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseVan Nuys Courthouse East |
Case Outcome TypeConsolidated Case-Non Lead |
Case Cycle Time72 days |
Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2012-06-05T00:00:00Document:Summons-Issued Filed by: Attorney-Defendant
Date: 2012-07-18T00:00:00Document:Summons-Issued Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2012-06-05T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: January 16, 2014Cross-Complaint Filed by KERRYGOLD PLUMBING INC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2012-07-26T00:00:00Answer Filed by JSL PLUMBING CO., INC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2012-07-18T00:00:00Summons-Issued (ON CROSS COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/X-Complainant
Date: 2012-07-26T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by JSL PLUMBING CO., INC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2012-07-18T00:00:00Proof of Service-Summons & Com (FLOW MASTER, LLC ) Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2012-07-12T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney-Defendant
Date: 2013-09-06T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: N/A
Date: 2012-06-05T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney-Defendant
Date: 2012-12-19T00:00:00Document:Complaint-Cross Filed by: Attorney-Defendant
Date: 2012-07-05T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney-Defendant
Date: 2012-07-26T00:00:00Document:Complaint-Cross Filed by: Attorney-Defendant
Date: 2012-07-18T00:00:00Document:Answer-Cross-Complaint Filed by: Attorney-Cross Defendant
Date: 2012-08-03T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service-Summons & Com Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2012-07-12T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney-Defendant
Date: 2012-07-18T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service-Summons & Com Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2012-06-29T00:00:00Document:Answer-Cross-Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Deft/X-Complainant
Date: 2012-07-30T00:00:00Document:Complaint-Cross Filed by: Attorney for Deft/X-Complainant
Date: 2012-07-26T00:00:00Document:Notice-Related Cases Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2012-07-19T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2012-08-06T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney-Defendant
Date: 2012-07-05T00:00:00Document:Summons-Issued Filed by: Attorney for Deft/X-Complainant
Date: 2012-07-26T00:00:00Document:Notice-Related Cases Filed by: Attorney-Defendant
Date: 2012-07-18T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Plaintiff
Date: October 11, 2013Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney-Defendant
Date: 2012-07-12T00:00:00Answer (JSL LUCAS PLUMBING CO, INC. ) Filed by Attorney-Defendant
Date: 2012-07-18T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by RUSSELL-WARNER INC (Legacy Party); ROTO-ROOTER PLUMBERS (Legacy Party)
Date: 2012-07-05T00:00:00Answer-Cross-Complaint Filed by RUSSELL-WARNER INC (Legacy Party); ROTO-ROOTER PLUMBERS (Legacy Party)
Date: 2012-07-30T00:00:00Answer-Cross-Complaint (OF KERRYGOLD PLUMBING, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/X-Complainant
Date: 2012-07-30T00:00:00Answer Filed by FLOW MASTERS LLC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2012-07-12T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by KERRYGOLD PLUMBING INC (Legacy Party)
Date: January 16, 2014Notice (NTC CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTY ) Filed by Attorney-Defendant
Date: 2012-12-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by null
Date: 2012-06-05T00:00:00Answer Filed by RUSSELL-WARNER INC (Legacy Party); ROTO-ROOTER PLUMBERS (Legacy Party)
Date: 2012-07-05T00:00:00Answer-Cross-Complaint ("KERRYGOLD PLUMBING, INC." ) Filed by Attorney-Cross Defendant
Date: 2012-08-03T00:00:00Answer Filed by Defendant
Date: 2013-09-06T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint Filed by 7301 MEDICAL CENTER ASSOCIATES INC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2012-06-29T00:00:00Proof of Service-Summons & Com (JSL LUCAS PLUMBING CO. INC. ) Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2012-07-12T00:00:00Notice Filed by KERRYGOLD PLUMBING INC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2012-12-19T00:00:00Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2012-08-06T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by 7301 MEDICAL CENTER ASSOCIATES INC (Plaintiff)
Date: October 11, 2013Answer (CROWN BUILDING MAINTENANCE CO. ) Filed by Attorney-Defendant
Date: 2013-09-06T00:00:00Answer Filed by KERRYGOLD PLUMBING INC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2012-07-26T00:00:00Summons-Issued Filed by 7301 MEDICAL CENTER ASSOCIATES INC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2012-06-05T00:00:00Notice-Related Cases (R/T LC095695 (DEPT B) ) Filed by Attorney-Defendant
Date: 2012-07-18T00:00:00Answer (FLOW MASTER, LLC ) Filed by Attorney-Defendant
Date: 2012-07-12T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Defendant
Date: 2012-07-18T00:00:00Proof of Service-Summons & Com (RUSSELL-WARNER, INC ) Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2012-06-29T00:00:00Summons-Issued Filed by JSL PLUMBING CO., INC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2012-07-18T00:00:00Answer (RUSSELL-WARNER, INC. dba ROTO ROOTER PLUMBERS ) Filed by Attorney-Defendant
Date: 2012-07-05T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by 7301 MEDICAL CENTER ASSOCIATES INC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2012-07-19T00:00:00Answer-Cross-Complaint Filed by FLOW MASTERS LLC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2012-08-03T00:00:00Proof of Service-Summons & Com (KERRYGOLD PLUMBING ) Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2012-07-12T00:00:00Notice-Related Cases (R/T LC095695 (DEPT B) ) Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2012-07-19T00:00:00Summons-Issued Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2012-06-05T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint Filed by 7301 MEDICAL CENTER ASSOCIATES INC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2012-07-12T00:00:00Answer (KERRYGOLD PLUMBING INC ) Filed by Attorney-Defendant
Date: 2012-07-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by 7301 MEDICAL CENTER ASSOCIATES INC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2012-08-06T00:00:00Summons-Issued (AS TO CROSS COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney-Defendant
Date: 2012-07-18T00:00:00Summons-Issued Filed by KERRYGOLD PLUMBING INC (Legacy Party)
Date: 2012-07-26T00:00:00Complaint Filed by 7301 MEDICAL CENTER ASSOCIATES INC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2012-06-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2012-08-06T00:00:00Proof of Service-Summons & Com (KERRYGOLD PLUMBING )
Date: 2012-07-12T00:00:00Answer (JSL LUCAS PLUMBING CO, INC. )
Date: 2012-07-18T00:00:00Proof of Service-Summons & Com (RUSSELL-WARNER, INC )
Date: 2012-06-29T00:00:00Complaint-Cross (KERRYGOLD PLUMBING, INC. VS FLOW MASTER, ET AL )
Date: 2012-07-26T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2012-07-05T00:00:00Answer-Cross-Complaint
Date: 2012-08-03T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint
Date: 2012-06-29T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2012-08-06T00:00:00Answer (RUSSELL-WARNER, INC. dba ROTO ROOTER PLUMBERS )
Date: 2012-07-05T00:00:00Answer (KERRYGOLD PLUMBING INC )
Date: 2012-07-26T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint
Date: 2012-07-12T00:00:00Answer-Cross-Complaint ("KERRYGOLD PLUMBING, INC." )
Date: 2012-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2012-06-05T00:00:00Summons-Issued
Date: 2012-06-05T00:00:00Summons-Issued (ON CROSS COMPLAINT )
Date: 2012-07-26T00:00:00Summons-Issued
Date: 2012-06-05T00:00:00Notice-Related Cases (R/T LC095695 (DEPT B) )
Date: 2012-07-19T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2012-06-05T00:00:00Notice-Related Cases (R/T LC095695 (DEPT B) )
Date: 2012-07-18T00:00:00Summons-Issued
Date: 2012-07-18T00:00:00Answer-Cross-Complaint
Date: 2012-07-30T00:00:00Answer-Cross-Complaint (OF KERRYGOLD PLUMBING, INC. )
Date: 2012-07-30T00:00:00Summons-Issued
Date: 2012-07-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2012-07-18T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2012-07-19T00:00:00Proof of Service-Summons & Com (JSL LUCAS PLUMBING CO. INC. )
Date: 2012-07-12T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2012-07-18T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2012-07-12T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2012-07-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2012-07-26T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2012-07-18T00:00:00Notice (NTC CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTY )
Date: 2012-12-19T00:00:00Summons-Issued (AS TO CROSS COMPLAINT )
Date: 2012-07-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2012-12-19T00:00:00Answer (FLOW MASTER, LLC )
Date: 2012-07-12T00:00:00Answer (CROWN BUILDING MAINTENANCE CO. )
Date: 2013-09-06T00:00:00Proof of Service-Summons & Com (FLOW MASTER, LLC )
Date: 2012-07-12T00:00:00Complaint-Cross (JSL LUCAS PLUMBING CO, INC. VS 7301 MEDICAL CENTER ASSOC, ET AL )
Date: 2012-07-18T00:00:00Complaint-Cross (RUSSELL-WARNER, INC. DBA ROTO ROOTER PLUMBERS VS FLOW MASTER, LLC, ET AL )
Date: 2012-07-05T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2012-07-05T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) (as to Kerrygold Plumbing Inc.; )
Date: January 16, 2014Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) (re: deft Kerrygold Plumbing Inc. only )
Date: October 11, 2013Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: January 16, 2014Answer
Date: 2013-09-06T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2013-10-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.