Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mary Cunningham Denise Barton, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Et Al, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Van Nuys Courthouse East with Unknown Judicial Officer presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 07, 1994 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice - Physicians & Surgeons (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseVan Nuys Courthouse East |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Register of Action - Public | |
May 17, 1996 | Hearing |
in Department A Unknown Event Type |
|
October 20, 1995 | Hearing |
in Department Legacy Unknown Event Type |
|
March 01, 1995 | Hearing |
in Department A Unknown Event Type |
|
January 10, 1995 | Hearing |
in Department M Unknown Event Type |
|
December 14, 1994 | Hearing |
in Department M Unknown Event Type |
|
November 14, 1994 | Hearing |
in Department M Unknown Event Type |
|
October 20, 1994 | Hearing |
in Department M Unknown Event Type |
|
October 05, 1994 | Hearing |
in Department M Unknown Event Type |
|
September 21, 1994 | Hearing |
in Department M Unknown Event Type |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.