Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Taylor, Dusty Renee, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Kim E. McBride Pera presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKim E. McBride Pera Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2019 |
CategoryAdult Non-Traffic Infractions |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2020 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Walk-In Traffic
Judge: McBride, Kim E |
|
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Walk-In Traffic
Judge: McBride, Kim E |
|
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Order/Stipulation for Judge Pro Tem | |
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Assessment Notice Sent | |
March 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Walk-In Traffic
Judge: McBride, Kim E |
|
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event | 60 Day Extension Granted | |
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Citation - Infractions | |
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | New Case Complaint Filed | |
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Courtesy Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.