Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Cheso, Nancy, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2016 |
CategoryAdult Non-Traffic Infractions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Cycle Time273 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
SARB Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
September 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
June 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
SARB Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
June 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
April 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
April 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
SARB Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
March 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
SARB Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
March 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
SARB Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.