Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Trask, Robert Austin, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis J. Buckley presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 07, 2011 |
CategoryAdult Non-Traffic Infractions |
Time To Trial54 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
|
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Case Cycle Time83 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Bail/Trust Forfeited | |
September 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Exhibit Destruction Verification (conversion) | |
June 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice and Order Disposition of Exhibits CV | |
February 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
February 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Amended Clerk Minutes | |
February 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
February 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Correction (at Counter/via Mail) | |
February 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
February 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Exhibit List | |
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.