Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Rodriguez, Michelle, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis J. Buckley presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2010 |
CategoryAdult Non-Traffic Infractions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Case Cycle Time59 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Shasta Collection - Odyssey | |
September 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Failure To Appear | |
September 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Check to Refer Case to Shasta | |
August 31, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Civil Assessment | |
February 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
February 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Walk-In Criminal
Judge: Buckley, Dennis J |
|
February 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Financial Assessment Sheet | |
February 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 24, 2011 | Docket Event | Request for Walk-In | |
January 24, 2011 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.