Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Spears, Vicki, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis J. Buckley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis J. Buckley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2005 |
CategoryAdult Non-Traffic Infractions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Case Cycle Time48 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2006 | Docket Event | Letter Received | |
February 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
SARB Court Trial
Judge: Buckley, Dennis J |
|
February 06, 2006 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
February 06, 2006 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 09, 2006 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
Walk-In Criminal
Judge: Buckley, Dennis J |
|
January 04, 2006 | Docket Event | Request for Walk-In | |
December 20, 2005 | Docket Event | Letter Returned | |
December 20, 2005 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.