Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Galindo, Pete Alex, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Michael A. Jacques presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2005 |
CategoryAdult Non-Traffic Infractions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Case Cycle Time764 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Shasta Collection - Odyssey | |
September 14, 2006 | Docket Event | Check to Refer Case to Shasta | |
August 29, 2006 | Docket Event | Letter Returned | |
August 16, 2006 | Docket Event | Notice of Civil Assessment | |
August 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Arraignment on Violation of Court Order
Judge: Jacques, Michael A |
|
August 16, 2006 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 10, 2006 | Docket Event | Letter Returned | |
December 22, 2005 | Docket Event | 60 Day Extension Granted - Clerk | |
December 15, 2005 | Docket Event | Letter Returned | |
December 15, 2005 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.