Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Xl Insurance, filed a(n) Unlimited Civil case against Manuel Iniguez Palacios, Mcmillan Electric, Palacios, Manuel Iniguez, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 20, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed
Date: August 20, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for XL Insurance
Date: August 20, 2021Initial Case Management Conference 01/20/2022 03:00 PM D- 514
Date: August 27, 2021Case Management Statement Filed by: XL Insurance (Plaintiff)
Date: January 06, 2022Answer Filed by: McMillan Electric (Defendant)
Date: November 29, 2021Minute Order (Initial Case Management Conference)
Date: January 21, 2022Order re: Initial Case Management Conference Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 21, 2022Notice of Payment of Advanced Jury Fee Filed by: McMillan Electric (Defendant)
Date: November 29, 2021Case Management Statement Filed by: McMillan Electric (Defendant)
Date: April 01, 2022Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: August 27, 2021Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: August 20, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint As to Manuel Iniguez Palacios Filed
Date: September 15, 2021Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 01/21/2022 02:00 PM D- 514
Date: September 14, 2021Case Management Statement Filed by: McMillan Electric (Defendant)
Date: January 07, 2022Case Management Statement Filed by: XL Insurance (Plaintiff)
Date: April 01, 2022Proof of Service on Complaint As to McMillan Electric Filed
Date: September 13, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for XL Insurance
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 01/20/2022 03:00 PM D- 514
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.