Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Smith, Christopher, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Doe 1, A Corporation Sole, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Brad Seligman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 26, 2021 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Tort |
Last RefreshedJune 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Motion Granted
Date: May 26, 2021Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: June 08, 2021Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Transferred
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort - Motion Transferred
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: June 08, 2021Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: May 28, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Christopher Smith
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00for in Camera finding for reasonable & Meritorious Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: May 26, 2021Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Case Management Conference 06/08/2021 03:00 PM D- 23
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: June 04, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.