Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
American Express Centurion Bank, A Utah State Chartered Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Hamel-Humdy, Doris A, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Julia Spain presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 30, 2017 |
CategoryCollections |
Time To Trial132 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions301 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time755 days |
Exhibits Filed
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Order Trial Setting ORder and Notice of Expedited Court Trial Filed
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2017-09-26T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2017-08-30T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Complaint - Collections Filed
Date: 2017-08-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Doris A Hamel-Humdy Filed
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for American Express Centurion Bank, a Utah state chartered bank
Date: 2017-08-30T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Judgment Entered
Date: June 27, 2018Proof of Service by Mail Declaration of Robert J. Rebhan in Lieu of Testimony Filed
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00List of Witness Filed
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Miscellaneous receipt for withdrawl of exhbitis Filed
Date: June 27, 2018Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Doris A Hamel-Humdy Filed
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Doris A Hamel-Humdy
Date: 2017-09-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement of American Express Centurion Bank, a Utah state chartered bank Filed
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 01/17/2018 09:30 AM D- 520
Date: 2017-09-26T00:00:00Writ of Execution - Unsatisfied from San Mateo Filed
Date: August 23, 2019Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed for American Express Centurion Bank, a Utah state chartered bank
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed
Date: June 27, 2018Proof of Service by Mail Declaration of Robert J. Rebhan in lieu of testimony Filed
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Writ of Execution - Unsatisfied from Santa Clara Filed
Date: September 24, 2019Civil Court Trial Commenced and Completed
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Writ of Execution - Unsatisfied from Bentura Filed
Date: February 04, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.