Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Salwan, Dharam P, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Tennis, Gidget A, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 11, 2013 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions8 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time70 days |
Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed
Date: 2013-03-11T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2013-03-11T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:
Date: April 12, 2013Application Re: Stay of Execution (UD - Possession) Filed for GIDGET A TENNIS
Date: 2013-04-02T00:00:00Default Judgment: Clerk's UD (CCP 1169) Entered
Date: 2013-03-19T00:00:00Order Granting Filed
Date: April 12, 2013Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for DHARAM P SALWAN
Date: 2013-03-11T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Granted
Date: April 12, 2013Application Re: Stay of Execution (UD - Possession) Conditionally Granted
Date: 2013-04-02T00:00:00Release of Funds Issued and Filed
Date: May 20, 2013Proof of Service on Complaint As to GIDGET A TENNIS Filed
Date: 2013-03-19T00:00:00Writ of Possession - Satisfied Filed
Date: April 10, 2013Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's UD Judgment (CCP 1169) As To GIDGET A TENNIS Filed
Date: 2013-03-19T00:00:00Release of Funds Issued and Filed
Date: April 22, 2013Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Issued
Date: 2013-03-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.