Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Suburban Auto Brokers,Inc., Thomas Hemmer, filed a(n) Unlimited Civil case against Afzal Akbar, Keith Akbar, Platte River Insurance Company, Suburban Auto Brokers,Inc., represented by Edward Mathewson, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 23, 2005 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed for Suburban Auto Brokers,Inc.
Date: July 06, 2007Judgment Entered
Date: June 26, 2007Civil Court Trial Commenced and Completed
Date: March 14, 2007Order re: Decision of Court Filed
Date: June 12, 2007Letter from Robert Padrick Filed
Date: March 16, 2007Letter from Edward Mathewson dated 8/18/06? Filed
Date: March 16, 2007Miscellaneous Notice of Release/Destruction of Exhibits Filed
Date: July 09, 2007Receipt for Withdrawal of Exhibit(s) Plaintiff's Filed
Date: July 26, 2007Proof of Service on Subpoena/Subpoena Duces Tecum Filed
Date: March 06, 2007Motion in Limine Plaintiff's Filed
Date: March 09, 2007Trial Brief Plaintiff's Filed
Date: March 09, 2007Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: March 09, 2007Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: March 12, 2007Trial Brief Plaintiff's Filed
Date: March 12, 2007Civil Court Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: March 13, 2007Ruling Taken Under Submission
Date: March 14, 2007Miscellaneous Consolidated Exhibit List Filed
Date: March 13, 2007Trial Brief Defendant's Filed
Date: March 09, 2007Exhibit Lists Plaintiff's Filed
Date: March 09, 2007List of Witness Plaintiff's Filed
Date: March 09, 2007Proof of Service on Subpoena/Subpoena Duces Tecum Filed
Date: March 15, 2007Judgment after Court Trial Filed
Date: June 26, 2007Rejection Letter Issued on Abstract of Judgment
Date: September 07, 2007For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.